Financial history GOOD DEEDS TRUST

Charity number: 1158706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.83k £35.13k £33.65k £57.52k £12.11k
Total expenditure £56.12k £28.88k £39.51k £54.59k £13.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.36k £500 N/A £2.93k