Financial history SURREY DISABLED PEOPLE'S PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1156963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £680.84k £653.34k £628.46k £812.95k £0
Total expenditure £746.06k £704.54k £611.83k £909.45k £60
Income from government contracts £572.39k £593.24k £561.08k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.79k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £89.68k £0 £40.16k £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £11.78k £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £680.84k £653.34k £6.57k £812.95k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £746.06k £704.54k £611.83k £909.45k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.72k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £611.83k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A