PUTNEY ARTS THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Putney Arts Theatre benefits the public through the advancement of the arts and also young people by providing educational opportunities focused on the arts and drama in particular.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
138 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 June 2014: CIO registration
- 17 October 2014: Funds received from 306028 GROUP 64
- GROUP 64 YOUTH THEATRE/PUTNEY THEATRE COMPANY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Cable | Chair | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elanne Brooks | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Crump | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Szymala | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Hannon | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ajay Shah | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Alexander Sainsbury | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jackson | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Copley | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Benton | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jillings | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.74k | £198.98k | £220.19k | £231.58k | £299.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £219.29k | £156.08k | £230.15k | £235.87k | £286.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £73.79k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 16 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY THE MEDIUM OF DRAMA, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND 3.1.2 TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, ESPECIALLY IN THE MEDIUM OF DRAMA AND THE ASSOCIATED ARTS, SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PUTNEY ARTS THEATRE
RAVENNA ROAD
LONDON
SW15 6AW
- Phone:
- 02087886943
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window