AGE UK CITY OF LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees agreed that the principle areas of focus of the Charity are :- - to support direct service provision both itself and through connections with Age Concerns/ Age UK?s in neighbouring London boroughs - to fundraise to support services for older people in London - to act as an oversight and co-ordination body for Age Concerns/Age UK services delivered in the City of London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £50,676 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
Governance
- 27 October 2014: Standard registration
- AGE CONCERN CITY OF LONDON (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bonny Ho | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Foley | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Miranda Frances | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Page | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Clark | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Burd | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Maureen Childs | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Carr | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.50k | £75.78k | £35.66k | £57.43k | £100.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.50k | £71.74k | £44.18k | £56.65k | £86.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £17.49k | £5.00k | £25.54k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.44k | £33.48k | N/A | £31.02k | £50.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/07/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/10/2014 as amended on 12 Sep 2020 as amended on 25 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ("THE OBJECTS") AND TO WHICH IT IS SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED ARE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE IN AND AROUND THE CITY OF LONDON: (1) PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE (2) ADVANCING EDUCATION (3) PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) (4) PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY (5) ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (6) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Age UK City of London
68 Parkway
London
NW1 7AH
- Phone:
- 020 7820 6770
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window