Dare To Dream Trust Wales

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust's objective is to transform the lives of disadvantaged children and young people; those who face daily, life-limiting challenges. It aims to raise life experiences, affect great change and enhance active lifestyles. This could be in the form of equipment, therapy, surgery, treatment, access to sport; all depending on the individual?s needs. The Trust carries out its activities in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 June 2014: CIO registration
- PRINCES GATE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JONES | Chair | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Parsons | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alun Jones | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE JONES | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL YOUNG | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
RYAN JONES | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARIA YOUNG | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.44k | £3.86k | £6.64k | £7.57k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.12k | £22.67k | £4.27k | £89.81k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Jun 2014 as amended on 22 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE ALL PURPOSES CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. TO WORK WITH AND MAKE GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS; IN ORDER TO AID IN SUPPORT SUCH AS RELIEF OF SICKNESS, ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH, SAVING LIVES, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, OVERSEAS AID AND FAMINE RELIEF. OUR EFFORTS WILL AID THE GENERAL PUBLIC, CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND MANKIND. WE WILL SUPPORT SERVICES WHO IN TURN PROVIDE HUMAN RESOURCES, FACILITIES AND BUILDINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hugh James
Two Central Square
Cardiff
CF10 1FS
- Phone:
- 01834831225
- Email:
- ENQUIRIES@DARE2DREAM.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window