Financial history THE NEED PROJECT CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity Number: 1157691
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £82.54k £233.82k £167.40k £212.11k £368.33k
Total expenditure £76.13k £102.30k £160.58k £197.96k £273.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £54.60k £55.59k £94.27k £104.31k