THE NEED PROJECT CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Need Project exists to provide compassionate and practical Christian responses to all our neighbours who are experiencing the effects of poverty and hardship. Our responses include the provision of food parcels for as long as required and resources allow, and where possible access to a safe place where our neighbours can come and be supported in finding the help they need in their journey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £104,310 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 02 July 2014: CIO registration
- 28 July 2023: Funds received from 1143539 INTO THE LIGHT MINISTRIES
- THE NEED PROJECT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT HARGREAVES CAIN | Chair | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAWN MICHELLE ADDAMS | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
GORDON HAMILTON | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Adams | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Cain | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Backhouse | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|||||
MR DOUG DEARDS | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.54k | £233.82k | £167.40k | £212.11k | £368.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.13k | £102.30k | £160.58k | £197.96k | £273.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.60k | £55.59k | £94.27k | £104.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 2 JULY 2014 as amended on 10 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIVE PERSONS IN CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THAT ARE IN POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. PROVIDING FOOD PACKAGES TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE EXPERIENCING FOOD DEPRIVATION. 2. PROVIDING OTHER ITEMS TO MEET IMMEDIATE AND ESSENTIAL NEEDS, AS RESOURCES ALLOW. 3. DEVELOPING OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT TO MEET IMMEDIATE NEED AND ALLEVIATE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 High Street
Stotfold
HITCHIN
Hertfordshire
SG5 4LL
- Phone:
- 07952 765302
- Email:
- admin@theneedproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window