THE WELSH RESERVES' AND CADETS' CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees will make grants, at their discretion, in support of the Reserves and Cadets of the Army, Royal Navy and Royal Air Force, as provided by the charitable purposes of the CIO.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 23 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAJOR JOHN EDWARD CHARLES TD DL | Chair | 06 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Joseph Gwyn Thomas MEd Bsc | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT DOWNIE REID RNR | Trustee | 23 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER LEWIS SINCLAIR | Trustee | 23 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHARLES CLIVE MACHIN RD DL RNR | Trustee | 23 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.76k | £29.63k | £29.73k | £33.31k | £34.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.53k | £26.30k | £45.56k | £34.39k | £44.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
19 February 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 May 2021 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 May 2021 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 May 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO SUPPORT FOR THE RESERVES AND CADETS OF THE ARMY, ROYAL NAVY AND ROYAL AIR FORCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O RESERVE FORCES' AND CADETS'
ASSOCIATION FOR WALES
MAINDY BARRACKS
CARDIFF
CF14 3YE
- Phone:
- 02920375730
- Email:
- wa-finance@rfca.mod.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window