MIDDLE EAST CONCERN - UK

Charity Number: 1158373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS  SEEKING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE  RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE  RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES  EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS 0001

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £436,246
Total expenditure: £485,975

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Luton
  • Abu Dhabi
  • Algeria
  • Egypt
  • Iran
  • Iraq
  • Israel
  • Jordan
  • Lebanon
  • Libya
  • Mauritania
  • Morocco
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Saudi Arabia
  • Somalia
  • Sudan
  • Syria
  • Tunisia
  • Turkey
  • Yemen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 August 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MEC (Working name)
  • MIDDLE EAST CONCERN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Elizabeth Mhamdi Trustee 11 April 2024
None on record
TANAS ALQASSIS Trustee 28 February 2018
SAT-7 UK TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
ASHRAF SALIB BASTOUROUS FARAHAT Trustee 27 August 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £415.16k £483.10k £324.85k £532.68k £436.25k
Total expenditure £454.76k £415.73k £376.26k £497.49k £485.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £532.68k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £497.49k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £13.75k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £85.38k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PO Box 1376
LUTON
LU1 9PP
Phone:
01582733742
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available