THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GILES WITH ST. MATTHEW CAMBERWELL

Charity number: 1156603
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Two Anglican churches in Camberwell

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £138,459
Total expenditure: £144,128

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 2014: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST. GILES CAMBERWELL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phyllis McLaughlin Trustee 28 May 2023
FRIENDS OF ST GILES CHURCH, CAMBERWELL
Received: On time
THE CAMBERWELL CHOIR SCHOOL
Received: On time
Doris Avbulimen Trustee 09 June 2022
FRIENDS OF ST GILES CHURCH, CAMBERWELL
Received: On time
THE CAMBERWELL CHOIR SCHOOL
Received: On time
Deborah Dairo Trustee 09 June 2022
FRIENDS OF ST GILES CHURCH, CAMBERWELL
Received: On time
THE CAMBERWELL CHOIR SCHOOL
Received: On time
Rev Nicholas Paul George Trustee 06 October 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £153.45k £117.80k £118.23k £115.82k £138.46k
Total expenditure £158.18k £123.87k £123.09k £125.98k £144.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 December 2024 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 December 2024 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 May 2024 199 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 May 2024 199 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 March 2022 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 March 2022 149 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PARISH OFFICE
St. Giles Centre
81 Camberwell Church Street
LONDON
SE5 8RB
Phone:
0207 703 4504