Financial history GREENFIELD GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1160162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £193.01k £165.26k £287.80k £175.64k £45.30k
Total expenditure £241.21k £218.81k £1.86m £1.17m £139.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A