DEAF HILL WARD REGENERATION PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A VOLUNTARY BODY OF RESIDENTS FROM DEAF HILL, TRIMDON STATION WHO HAVE COME TOGETHER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR LOCAL RESIDENTS. IT IS OUR INTENTION TO ENGAGE IN PROJECTS THAT WILL HELP TO RESTORE COMMUNITY SPIRIT AND IMPROVE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITHIN DEAF HILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 30 April 2014: CIO registration
- 20 January 2016: Funds received from 1102867 DEAF HILL WARD REGENERATION PARTNERSHIP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Bradley | Chair | 02 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Stephanie Thornton | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Young | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mary Grigg | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Neil Young | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joe Frances | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
LARRAINE GRIGG | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAY TWEDDLE | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Chatterley | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
sharron Young | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.45k | £88.35k | £87.59k | £84.33k | £71.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.76k | £60.51k | £69.73k | £97.61k | £86.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £9.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE WARD OF DEAF HILL BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY: (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT: (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE: (D) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES: (E) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE: (F) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT: (G) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME: (H) THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF HEALTH ISSUES FOR THE COMMUNITY: (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES: (J) TO BE A NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATION DESIGNED TO PROMOTE AND SUSTAIN THE REGENERATION OF THE WARD THROUGH THE INVOLVEMENT OF THE COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC AND PRIVATE SECTORS: (K) TO CONTRIBUTE EFFECTIVELY TO THE DELIVERY, CO-ORDINATION, MONITORING AND REVIEW OF THE PROJECTS AS CONTAINED IN THE ACTION PLAN PREPARED, AGREED AND PRIORITISED BY THE PARTNERSHIP: (L) TO CONTRIBUTE EFFECTIVELY TO THE DELIVERY, CO-ORDINATION, MONITORING AND REVIEW OF THE PROJECTS AS CONTAINED IN THE ACTION PLAN PREPARED, AGREED AND PRIORITISED BY THE PARTNERSHIP: (M) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRIMDON STATION COMMUNITY CENTRE
STATION ROAD EAST
TRIMDON STATION
TS29 6BS
- Phone:
- 01429882200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window