BURNOPFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Burnopfield community association hold a number of activities for young and old alike Pandas Play School Parents Toddlers Ladies Keep Fit for over 50 yrs Kickboxing for children age 5 to 15yrs kickboxing for adults three times per week scouts beavers cubs friendship club for the elderly male &female Quit making chiropodist once per month blood donors every three month coffee monthly dog trianing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
- Gateshead
Governance
- 23 July 2014: CIO registration
- 16 July 2015: Funds received from 700247 BURNOPFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Brown | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Mitchell-Hurd | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE CLARK | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MINTO | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY BATKIN | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jean Bell | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Kirkley | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.97k | £27.99k | £32.57k | £17.98k | £29.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.50k | £21.31k | £21.82k | £28.73k | £45.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.08k | £15.79k | £19.34k | £3.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BURNOPFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER:TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 EWEHURST GARDENS
DIPTON
STANLEY
DH9 9HZ
- Phone:
- 01207270319
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window