Financial history THE WENDOVER PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1157324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £59.14k £60.40k £59.92k £63.22k £81.00k
Total expenditure £62.03k £58.86k £62.17k £64.33k £74.90k
Income from government contracts £44.19k £44.05k £38.96k £47.39k £55.15k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £200 N/A