BRITISH ETHNIC HEALTH AWARENESS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include providing a basic level of assistance and often emergency care, to those in need. The services are typically provided free of charge and would be funded by donations, grants and especially our main focus of donors will be general ?masses". Working independently and in partnership with other organisations to fund healthcare and other research based projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Pakistan
Governance
- 01 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NADE ALI | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SYED BABAR NAQVI | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
HYDER ABBAS | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 April 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 03 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND PAKISTAN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 WEAVER CHASE
RADCLIFFE
MANCHESTER
M26 1RF
- Phone:
- 07973532134
- Email:
- behat@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window