NORTHWICH MULTISPORTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing services to families who have a disabled child. Direct services to the children - Saturday and holiday clubs. Outreach services - Support and signposting for families. Volunteering opportunities. Community education, liaison and development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 06 May 2014: CIO registration
- MULTISPORTS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Philip Bantock | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Annie Barsoum | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joseph Mark Martin | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.38k | £50.39k | £55.01k | £40.73k | £49.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.52k | £39.37k | £53.92k | £48.24k | £47.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 May 2014
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE THE PARTICIPATION OF DISABLED AND ABLE-BODIED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY IMPROVING ACCESS TO SPORT, RECREATION AND LEISURE FACILITIES; (2)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND RESOURCES TO ASSIST PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPACITY AND SKILLS AS COACHES, VOLUNTEERS AND MENTORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northwich District Youth Club
Winnington Lane
Northwich
CW84DE
- Phone:
- 07732043137
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window