UPTON VILLAGES TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Upton Villages Together will explore opportunities to extend periods during which the library building is available, including evenings and weekends, to be offered to groups/organisations for meetings, training, education, recreation, leisure; the objective being to improve and benefit the lives of residents and the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 April 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 11 November 2014: CIO registration
- UPTON UPON SEVERN AND DISTRICT LIBRARY TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN MAIR | Chair | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jade Millar | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Manise | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIMON MICHAEL YATES | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/04/2019 | 08/04/2020 | 08/04/2021 | 08/04/2022 | 08/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.05k | £5.03k | £5.03k | £5.03k | £5.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.11k | £5.03k | £5.03k | £5.03k | £5.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.03k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Annual return | 08 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 April 2022 | 18 January 2024 | 344 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 820 days | |
Annual return | 08 April 2021 | 18 January 2024 | 709 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1185 days | |
Annual return | 08 April 2020 | 18 January 2024 | 1074 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2020 | 18 January 2024 | 1074 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF UPTON UPON SEVERN AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ASSIST IN THE RUNNING OF THE UPTON UPON SEVERN AND DISTRICT LIBRARY AND TO MAINTAIN, DEVELOP OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE, DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A LIBRARY FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Queens Mead
Upton-upon-Severn
Worcester
WR8 0ND
- Phone:
- 07587239471
- Email:
- chrisjmair@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window