LANCASTER FOOTCARE SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and protection of good health of the elderly and disabled population of Enfield and the surrounding area by the provision of foot care services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Enfield
Governance
- 27 June 2014: Standard registration
- LANCASTER TOENAIL SERVICE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Raymond Whitaker | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Anne Window | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
BIRGITTA LOUISE WHITAKER | Trustee | 27 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE SMITH | Trustee | 27 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIM FELLOWS | Trustee | 27 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.00k | £11.68k | £29.67k | £32.40k | £41.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.23k | £17.29k | £37.32k | £37.37k | £45.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEP 2013 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2014
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THE ELDERLY AND DISABLED POPULATION OF ENFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FOOT CARE SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lancaster Centre
53 Lancaster Road
ENFIELD
EN2 0BU
- Phone:
- 02082453628
- Email:
- tim.fellows@LGBTenfield.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window