HAMPSHIRE CULTURAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust champions world-class culture and exists to showcase, connect and empower Hampshire's creative economy. The charity works collaboratively to bring organisations, people and ideas together for greater impact. Our vision We will strive to be the champion of world-class culture in Hampshire Our mission To showcase, connect and empower Hampshire?s culture and creative economy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£9,251,219
Donations and legacies | £77.41k | |
Charitable activities | £7.09m | |
Other trading activities | £1.40m | |
Investments | £15.79k | |
Other | £666.43k |
Total expenditure:
£9,059,735
Raising funds | £1.68m | |
Charitable activities | £7.38m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,860,183 from 47 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.68m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.38m | |
Retained for future use | £191.48k |
People

264 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
384 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- HCT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Charles Lovell | Chair | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Joan Branson | Trustee | 21 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Charles Knox Wright | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|||||
James Robert Zalles Croxford | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Torr Brett | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Karen Davina Chillman | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Benita Miller | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hugh McNaughtan | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Lucille Diane Thompson | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Blackman | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helene Louise West | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Winkworth | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Emma Back | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.88m | £5.97m | £7.71m | £8.37m | £9.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.59m | £5.55m | £7.63m | £9.03m | £9.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.39m | £4.70m | £4.98m | £4.25m | £4.86m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £184.92k | £64.69k | £175.62k | £163.00k | £77.41k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £838.36k | £314.69k | £810.27k | £1.20m | £1.40m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.57m | £5.40m | £6.34m | £6.44m | £7.09m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.90k | £6.47k | £6.38k | £8.69k | £15.79k | |
|
Income - Other | £274.49k | £178.03k | £376.83k | £549.90k | £666.43k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.93m | £5.22m | £6.93m | £7.63m | £7.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £658.39k | £330.13k | £700.79k | £1.39m | £1.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.25k | £14.35k | £12.05k | £30.50k | £35.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £19.17k | £16.64k | £14.52k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £279.83k | £380.41k | £313.63k | £764.89k | £525.61k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.40m | £2.58m | £2.96m | £2.70m | £3.05m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £749.74k | £609.88k | £846.24k | £1.12m | £1.05m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/09/2014 as amended on 25 Sep 2020 as amended on 24 Sep 2021 as amended on 30 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTIVES (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE PUBLIC'S UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING BY: (I) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (II) PROVIDING COMMUNITY ARTS CENTRES AND COMMUNITY ARTS PROGRAMMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND (III) BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE; AND (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF HAMPSHIRE AND THE WIDER AREA OF THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND, INCLUDING BY: (I) ACQUIRING, PRESERVING AND EXHIBITING, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, LANDS AND TENEMENTS (INCLUDING BUILDINGS) OF BEAUTY OR HISTORIC INTEREST WITH A VIEW TO EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE OF SUCH LANDS AND TENEMENTS IN THE HERITAGE OF THE NATION AND THE LOCAL AREA; (II) PRESERVING, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, FURNITURE, PICTURES AND CHATTELS OF ANY DESCRIPTION HAVING NATIONAL AND LOCAL HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST WITH A VIEW TO EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE OF SUCH FURNITURE, PICTURES AND CHATTELS IN THE HERITAGE OF THE NATION AND THE LOCAL AREA; AND (III) BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mrs Clare Sadler
HAMPSHIRE CULTURAL TRUST
CHILCOMB LANE
WINCHESTER
SO23 8RD
- Phone:
- 01962396935
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window