EVANGELISTIC MEDICAL MISSIONS ABROAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EMMA recruits volunteer health care professionals from the UK and overseas for short term medical missions in resource-poor settings, both rural and urban, in nations where we have a contact or invitation from a Christian church or organisation that can provide local support. Since 2010 EMMA has organised trips to Kenya, India, Ghana, Liberia, Indonesia and Sierra Leone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Liberia
Governance
- 26 August 2014: Standard registration
- EMMA (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RICHARD ALEXANDER SCOTT | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE AJANTA KUMARI LOUIS | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.22k | £4.45k | £9.91k | £25.72k | £4.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.17k | £5.34k | £4.04k | £32.39k | £9.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/07/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL AID AND SERVICES TO REMOTE LOCALITIES WHO HAVE LIMITED ACCESS TO MEDICAL AND DENTAL CARE, AND BY COLLABORATING WITH OTHER LOCAL CHARITIES AND EVANGELICAL CHURCHES IN THOSE COUNTRIES TO HELP DELIVER HEALTH CARE IN THEIR COMMUNITIES, ALL UNDERTAKEN WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 REDFERN CLOSE
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2DT
- Phone:
- 07876442438
- Email:
- louiscarol@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window