Accounts and annual returns CHIOMA EMMANUEL GLOBAL MINISTRY
Charity number: 1158575

Charity reporting is overdue by 802 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 436 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 436 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 802 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 802 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 20 March 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 20 March 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window