THE MOORE THOMPSON CHARITY FUND CIO

Charity number: 1157575
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

OFFERING SUPPORT TO LOCAL CHARITIES AND NOT-FOR-PROFIT IN THE LOCAL AREAS OF SPALDING, DEEPING AND WISBECH

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017

Total income: £5,893
Total expenditure: £6,990

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public. It works with commercial participators without an agreement in place.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 2014: CIO registration
  • 15 February 2019: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 15 February 2019: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MT CHARITY FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £4.77k £3.89k £5.89k
Total expenditure £746 £4.22k £6.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 25 April 2016 On Time