COVENTRY GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a Gospel Hall near Coventry for the religious activities of Christians often referred to as "Brethren". Further details about the Brethren can be found on their website www.plymouthbrethrenchristianchurch.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
Governance
- 16 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harvey James Douglass | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Taylor | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN JENKIN | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAIN WILLIAM MITCHELL | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUPERT NELSON | Trustee | 03 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.73k | £218.32k | £94.29k | £97.54k | £384.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.42k | £798.69k | £182.62k | £154.44k | £178.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 AUG 1983 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING BY THE CARRYING ON OF THE SERVICE OF GOD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS OF THE HOLY BIBLE AS FOLLOWED BY THOSE CHRISTIANS FORMING PART OF A WORLDWIDE FELLOWSHIP KNOWN AS THE "PLYMOUTH BRETHREN CHRISTIAN CHURCH" (THE "BRETHREN") WHOSE CORE DOCTRINE IS SUMMARISED IN SCHEDULE 1 TO THIS DEED AND WHOSE PROPER PRACTICES IN FURTHERANCE OF SOME ASPECTS OF THAT CORE DOCTRINE ARE SUMMARISED IN SCHEDULE 2 TO THIS DEED; AND (B) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH BRETHREN.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY CITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
COVENTRY GOSPEL HALL TRUST
BRETHREN GOSPEL HALL
BOSWORTH CLOSE
BAGINTON
NEAR COVENTRY
- Phone:
- 02476511662
- Email:
- enquiries@covght.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window