Financial history BRITISH ALBANIAN MUSLIM COMMUNITY

Charity Number: 1159724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.68k £33.39k £47.43k £56.01k £50.10k
Total expenditure £26.71k £25.15k £28.44k £31.60k £26.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.66k N/A N/A N/A