THE ASHTONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds throughout the year to donate or otherwise distribute for the benefit of any charitable body or charitable bodies, or for any other charitable purpose, as the trustees in their absolute discretion think fit in such exclusively charitable ways as the charity trustees think fit in furtherance of these objects. The charity operates in the East of England and West Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Leeds City
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 08 August 2014: CIO registration
- THE ASHTON KCJ CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN MICHAEL BROWN | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||||
Lynn Josephine Wicks | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
ADRIAN STUART MUNDELL | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.29k | £13.30k | £3.97k | £23.46k | £11.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.50k | £11.50k | £11.00k | £18.00k | £16.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 08 AUG 2014 AMENDED ON 22 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN SUCH WAYS THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, TO RAISE FUNDS THROUGHOUT THE YEAR TO DONATE OR OTHERWISE DISTRIBUTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY CHARITABLE BODY OR CHARITABLE BODIES, OR FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT IN SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chequers House
77-81 Newmarket Road
CAMBRIDGE
- Phone:
- 01223363111
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window