THE PRIMARY SHAKESPEARE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity?s purpose as set out in the objects contained in the company?s memorandum of association is to: ?advance education for the public benefit by the promotion of the arts, in particular, but not exclusively, the art of drama.? The aim of the charity is to raise childhood achievement and attainment through engaging with Shakespeare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 June 2014: Standard registration
- PSC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toyin Okitikpi | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
DENISE RAWLS | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Sandle | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MALLIN-ROBINSON | Trustee | 03 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fletcher | Trustee | 10 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS WILLOUGHBY STUART CB MA | Trustee | 10 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £349.30k | £288.90k | £316.61k | £328.17k | £262.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.32k | £274.37k | £289.21k | £314.88k | £351.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF DRAMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Primary Shakespeare Company
7th Floor
The Dutch House
High Holborn
LONDON
WC1V 7LL
- Phone:
- 07882286895
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window