CHRIST ROYAL CHURCH WORLDWIDE

Charity Number: 1157447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement and proclamation of beliefs of the Christian faith. This is achieved through the running of regular church services, outreaches and other events. Currently, the charity carries out most of its activities in and around Croydon.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £52,317
Total expenditure: £62,313

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 June 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eromona Whiskey Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
LOTTIE CARAMBA-COKER Trustee 13 October 2018
None on record
Kofo Awosusi Trustee 11 June 2014
None on record
PASTOR IBIKUNLE OLUWAKOREDE AWOSUSI Trustee 11 June 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £63.63k £42.58k £84.57k £52.15k £52.32k
Total expenditure £27.25k £5.17k £39.73k £44.02k £62.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Blackford Close
South Croydon
CR2 6BT
Phone:
07985442270
Website:

No information available