The Namugongo Partnership

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance theological education in Uganda and across the world and raise awareness in the UK of the needs elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Barnet
- Enfield
- Uganda
Governance
- 22 June 2015: Standard registration
- OAK HILL COLLEGE UGANDA PROJECT (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Alexander Hardyman | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Brooks-Plunkett | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Wright | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Charles Fairbairn | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.08k | £37.58k | £24.81k | £23.87k | £19.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.26k | £38.84k | £27.11k | £23.63k | £27.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/04/2015 as amended on 02 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL, MATERIAL AND HUMAN RESOURCES TO THE UGANDAN MARTYRS SEMINARY, NAMUGONGO. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD, NAMELY OF THE UGANDAN MARTYRS SEMINARY, NAMUGONGO AND BY CARRYING OUT RELIGIOUS DEVOTIONAL ACTS INCLUDING PRAYER AND PREACHING TO SUPPORT THIS WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAK HILL COLLEGE
CHASE SIDE
LONDON
N14 4PS
- Phone:
- 07830081198
- Email:
- tim.fairbairn@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window