Financial history COMMUNITY HEART PRODUCTIONS

Charity Number: 1157898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.68k £97.18k £63.42k £99.14k £85.23k
Total expenditure £34.07k £43.35k £79.87k £102.24k £106.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A