Financial history JACKSDALE MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 504718
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.83k £5.98k £9.64k £12.69k £15.73k
Total expenditure £16.67k £10.89k £14.48k £14.49k £15.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £12.00k N/A