Accounts and annual returns SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR DYSLEXIA

Charity Number: 1158423
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 February 2025 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 February 2025 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 September 2024 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 May 2021 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 May 2021 99 days late Download Open in new window