PRISM ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prism Arts is an inclusive arts organisation. This means that we set up and run arts projects that are fully accessible to all. Our priority is to develop projects that enable disabled people, young people and older people to engage in the arts. Our projects are always delivered by professional artists; this means that the quality of our work is very high.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,996 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 January 2015: CIO registration
- 15 February 2017: Funds received from 1010059 PRISM ARTS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliet Joy Fellows-Smith | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Verity Georgina Shillabeer | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Conor James Pitcher | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Gilbert Miss | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McGrath | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Walden | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sonny Smith | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £312.97k | £271.10k | £264.10k | £241.27k | £263.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £302.96k | £232.35k | £249.49k | £238.47k | £258.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £62.83k | £18.00k | £21.36k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF CREATIVE ARTS; 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF PERSONS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY, AGE OR ILL HEALTH, BY THE PROVISION OF THE CREATIVE ARTS WITH A VIEW TO OVERCOMING BARRIERS TO INCLUSION INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Central Methodist Hall
5 Market Street
CARLISLE
CA3 8QJ
- Phone:
- 01228587691
- Email:
- office@prismarts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window