Financial history MAKING MIRACLES

Charity Number: 1158233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £200.67k £261.08k £203.61k £247.52k £286.28k
Total expenditure £142.61k £154.09k £176.74k £232.09k £251.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A