BIBI FAISAL SHAH MOHAMMED WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the trust are to be changed to The relief of poverty, promotion of health and advancement of education by providing or assisting in the provision of goods, supplies and charitable relief in Pakistan
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- India
- Pakistan
- Zambia
Governance
- 09 February 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FAQIR MOHAMMED | Chair | 09 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nawab Ali | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
NAWAB BIBI | Trustee | 09 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £5.99k | £15.20k | £15.82k | £17.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.62k | £12.10k | £12.44k | £17.08k | £23.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 May 2025 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 APR 2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15/01/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF GOODS SUPPLIES AND CHARITABLE RELIEF IN PAKISTAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
121 Green Pastures
Stockport
SK4 3RB
- Phone:
- 070405863244
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window