TRANSITION BRO GWAUN LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) The promotion of the conservation, protection and improvement of the natural environment and prudent use of natural resources for the benefit of the public in Fishguard, Goodwick and environs by advancing education and raising awareness of climate change & resource scarcity ; promoting individual, community and organisational commitment to a reduction in CO2 emissions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £2,807 from 1 government contract(s) and £31,385 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 02 December 2014: Standard registration
- TBG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS SAMRA | Chair | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Robert Edward Latter | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Moffett | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.28k | £17.14k | £19.02k | £56.79k | £110.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.74k | £18.05k | £16.35k | £32.81k | £78.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.81k | |
|
Income from government grants | £38.94k | £3.37k | £7.32k | £214 | £31.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 January 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 15 January 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JUN 2011 as amended on 04 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (?OBJECTS?) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1) THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN FISHGUARD, GOODWICK AND ENVIRONS BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS OF CLIMATE CHANGE, RESOURCE SCARCITY, PEAK OIL AND ECONOMIC RESILIENCE; PROMOTING INDIVIDUAL, COMMUNITY AND ORGANISATIONAL COMMITMENT TO A REDUCTION IN CO2 EMISSIONS, ENERGY SAVING, REDUCING RELIANCE UPON CARBON EMITTING SOURCES, AND INCREASING RESILIENCE TO RESOURCE SCARCITY. 2) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE CITIZENS OF FISHGUARD, GOODWICK AND ENVIRONS BY: A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND REGENERATION IN ORDER TO REDUCE RELIANCE ON SCARCE RESOURCES INCLUDING OIL. C) SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT OF FISHGUARD, GOODWICK AND ENVIRONS MEANS DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT CITIZENS OF FISHGUARD, GOODWICK AND ENVIRONS WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS OF FISHGUARD, GOODWICK AND ENVIRONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Glyn-Y-Mel Road
Lower Town
FISHGUARD
Dyfed
SA65 9LY
- Phone:
- 01348872019
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window