TASTELIFEUK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
What does tastelife offer? Eight-session weekly community group course for sufferers of eating disorders, and carers; tools for recovery Training for volunteers to run the course Information day on eating disorders for professionals Setting up centres around the UK as part of our roll-out programme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Mason | Chair | 24 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Jeffrey William Cotterill | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Peter Douglas Jackson | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Niblett | Trustee | 27 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Eleanor Mason | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hurst | Trustee | 19 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT DUDLEY | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.52k | £128.25k | £101.42k | £112.64k | £122.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.42k | £70.43k | £91.46k | £125.17k | £159.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUFFERERS OF EATING DISORDERS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING COURSES, SUPPORT GROUPS AND INTERNET BASED RESOURCES DESIGNED TO INFORM, ADVISE AND SUPPORT THEM. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN EATING DISORDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hales
Red Lane
Burton Green
Kenilworth
CV8 1PB
- Phone:
- 07845089400
- Email:
- di.archer@tastelifeuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window