KORI DEVELOPMENT PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1158663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We operate in the Kori District of Sierra Leone. We help to educate and empower women and girls to become self sufficient and to help them eradicate the cultural habits that are detrimental to the health and progress of the people. We do this by giving grants to local organisations to provide help and support to build a thriving community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £22,011
Total expenditure: £24,698

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Sierra Leone

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 September 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • KWDP (Working name)
  • KORI WOMEN'S DEVELOPMENT PROJECT LTD (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET SIMSON Chair 03 July 2014
None on record
Rosemary Sylvia Hutchinson Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record
ANNE CHILD Trustee 28 July 2019
SHINE AFRICAN CHILDREN'S TRUST
Received: On time
DIAMOND EDUCATION GRANT
Received: On time
Brenda Tumber Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
GILLIAN CHRISTINE CURRY Trustee 02 May 2015
None on record
YOKO BREWAH Trustee 15 April 2014
None on record
ROSE SIMBO Trustee 15 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £58.90k £23.18k £52.52k £14.12k £22.01k
Total expenditure £53.45k £27.89k £51.40k £11.55k £24.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 17 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 26 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 13 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 09 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 27 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 27 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 COLLEGE ROAD
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 6AT
Phone:
07889187099