Accounts and annual returns DEEN RELIEF LIMITED

Charity number: 1158608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 13 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 13 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 21 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 22 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 08 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 June 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required