Financial history DEEN RELIEF LIMITED

Charity number: 1158608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £21.85k £30.89k £43.75k £77.47k £26.20k
Total expenditure £21.94k £16.00k £35.24k £91.48k £39.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A