Financial history WYCLIFFE HALL

Charity Number: 1156892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.53m £2.69m £2.44m £2.95m £4.29m
Total expenditure £2.46m £2.51m £2.68m £3.37m £4.85m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £318.84k £892.73k £333.39k £576.41k £1.12m
Income - Other trading activities £78.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.13m £1.79m £1.85m £1.92m £2.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £580 £4 £261.82k £452.85k £554.80k
Income - Legacies £0 £80.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.37m £2.40m £2.45m £2.86m £4.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £94.29k £115.73k £207.85k £378.74k £251.64k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £26.07k £133.05k £212.22k