Financial history OPERA PRELUDE

Charity number: 1158309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £131.63k £119.81k £88.59k £118.00k £150.78k
Total expenditure £87.33k £87.27k £83.83k £93.91k £110.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.18k £450 N/A N/A