OPERA PRELUDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the art and advance the education of the public in opera and young performers and musicians in the early stages of their careers by the provision in particular by performance based lectures and opera related events. Please see www.operaprelude.com for further information
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 21 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIONA ANNE HAMILTON | Chair | 21 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Martin | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Plumptre | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chiara Macarti Speranza | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Clare Clifford | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Burch | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADRIANA FESTEU MPHIL | Trustee | 21 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.63k | £119.81k | £88.59k | £118.00k | £150.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.33k | £87.27k | £83.83k | £93.91k | £110.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.18k | £450 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ART AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN OPERA AND YOUNG PERFORMERS AND MUSICIANS IN THE EARLY STAGES OF THEIR CAREERS BY THE PROVISION IN PARTICULAR BY PERFORMANCE BASED LECTURES AND OPERA RELATED EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Round Hill House
Fawley
Henley-on-Thames
RG9 6HU
- Phone:
- 07908894333
- Email:
- operaprelude@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window