Financial history FAREHAM CHURCH OF FREE SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS

Charity number: 1157421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.37k £23.12k £24.15k £25.58k £22.58k
Total expenditure £12.72k £10.56k £7.55k £19.45k £27.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A