CHRYSALIS YOUTH EMPOWERMENT NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support African young people through training as changemakers, providing recreational/educational activities to enable them to participate in society as mature & responsible people.To prevent poverty in Africa, by providing grants, items and services to those in need, particularly through indigenous African organisations.To promote children's rights.To promote sustainable development in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Uganda
Governance
- 29 August 2014: CIO registration
- CYEN (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Bale | Chair | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Panter | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Denise Taylor | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Foster | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Teil Chooi Oh | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.50k | £211.49k | £182.22k | £199.48k | £169.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.23k | £209.24k | £190.54k | £155.61k | £186.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2025 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2025 | 173 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2024 | 174 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGE OF 5 YEARS AND 25 YEARS OF AGE LIVING IN UGANDA AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PREVENTING OR RELIEVING POVERTY (E) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 PRINCE OF WALES LANE
YARDLEY WOOD
BIRMINGHAM
B14 4LB
- Phone:
- 01214308980
- Email:
- socentafrica@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window