Financial history ADINATH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1160214
Charity reporting is overdue by 164 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/01/2019 16/01/2020 16/01/2021 16/01/2022 16/01/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A