CITY CHURCH MANCHESTER CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Proclamation of the Gospel of Jesus Christ within Greater Manchester, and supporting other churches abroad. The training and education of Christian Ministers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
146 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Tameside
- Trafford
Governance
- 11 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW WALDOCK | Chair | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Christopher Hyde | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN THEED | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
RALPH MATTHEW CUNNINGTON | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Harriet Hyde | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SPRINGATE BSC | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £434.95k | £620.64k | £388.19k | £689.81k | £459.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £337.31k | £461.55k | £350.24k | £423.67k | £533.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £360 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £615.70k | N/A | £680.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £4.93k | N/A | £9.15k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £452.74k | N/A | £406.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £8.81k | N/A | £17.54k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £975 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
(1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH EXCLUSIVELY BY FACILITATING THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE FELLOWSHIP; AND(2)SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS SHALL,IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE FELLOWSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
City Church Manchester
Methodist Central Hall
Oldham Street
MANCHESTER
M1 1JQ
- Phone:
- 07738633509
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window