Financial history THE ADVENTURE DOLPHIN (PANGBOURNE) CHARITY

Charity Number: 1156978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £75.01k £37.20k £53.27k £69.00k £93.70k
Total expenditure £68.84k £20.67k £52.06k £67.21k £106.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.65k £8.00k N/A N/A