Accounts and annual returns EDUCATION FAST FORWARD LIMITED
Charity Number: 1158905
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 18 May 2017 | 06 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 June 2017 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 27 June 2017 | 147 days late | |
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 24 June 2016 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | 02 June 2016 | 94 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window