JRC SIMPSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Transforming the care, support and protection of children affected by domestic homicide and abuse (DH&A) Promote advancement of education, protection of health, and relief of distress in the UK and Crown Dependencies (UK&CD) Advance education of the public in the subject and effects of DH&A Build the capability and capacity of organisations, networks and groups in the UK&CD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
Governance
- 23 July 2014: CIO registration
- JOANNA SIMPSON FOUNDATION (Working name)
- JSF (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kieran Rumsby | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Christopher Brown | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Diane Brown | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Gaynor Bailey | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Duncan Hunter | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Mary Quinn | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Mary Stanley | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIANA PARKES | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.71k | £28.97k | £30.87k | £19.82k | £62.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.36k | £21.44k | £25.86k | £21.75k | £39.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 May 2024
(These accounts |
24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY BUILDING THE CAPABILITY AND CAPACITY OF ORGANISATIONS, NETWORKS AND GROUPS FOR THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF DISTRESS FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES AFFECTED BY DOMESTIC HOMICIDE AND ABUSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Hall Farm
Humberston Road
New Waltham
Grimsby
North East Lincolnshire
DN36 4SD
- Phone:
- 01624625765
- Email:
- INFO@JSFOUNDATION.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.JSFOUNDATION.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window