MRKH CONNECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity Activities: 1. To create a safe, informative, and supportive website with a database of girls and women, with MRKH, so that they are able to connect with each other. 2. To create a website that medical professionals can refer girls and women with MRKH to, that provides guidance and peer support through their initial diagnosis, and ongoing life stages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Cannell | Chair | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hensley | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michelle Lipton | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Saxby | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Bishop | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Maclenan | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.26k | £7.90k | £4.26k | £11.23k | £7.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £498 | £3.51k | £3.92k | £11.20k | £7.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Jun 2014 as amended on 05 May 2020 as amended on 05 May 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the charity are: a) To relieve and promote the relief of those diagnosed and living with Mayer Rokitansky Kuster Hauser (MRKH) Syndrome and to provide support and resources for such persons and their families, in particular but not exclusively by: i. The provision of a forum/s where individuals living with MRKH syndrome can connect with each other. ii. The provision of a wider support network and resources for everyone, including the families of those living with MRKH. b) To advance public education (including scientific education) and awareness in matters relating to MRKH syndrome, in particular but not exclusively by: i. Working with other organisations within the UK and globally for the benefit of those diagnosed and living with MRKH syndrome
Contact information
- Address:
-
White Friars Chapel
Monks Lane
WADHURST
East Sussex
TN5 6EN
- Phone:
- 07708397119
- Email:
- info@mrkhconnect.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window